Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Child Pornography
Sponsored by
Delegates Lopez, Wilson, Acevero, B. Barnes, Bartlett, Cardin, Feldmark, Glenn, Grammer, Harrison, Kelly, Mosby, Queen, Reznik, Solomon, Stewart, Wells, Atterbeary, Malone, J. Lewis, Sydnor, Moon, Crutchfield, McComas, Pippy, Hartman, R. Watson, Arikan, Shetty, W. Fisher, Cox, Anderson, and Conaway
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 325
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Altering certain definitions applicable to certain prohibitions against possessing, distributing, and creating child pornography; prohibiting a person from knowingly possessing and intentionally retaining a certain representation showing a computer-generated image that is indistinguishable from an actual and identifiable child under the age of 16 years portrayed in a certain manner; defining "indistinguishable from an actual child"; and applying certain penalties.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0736
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - Child Pornography
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {642213/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Child Pornography
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {518379/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Atterbeary, R. Watson and Pippy)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Atterbeary, R. Watson and Pippy)
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Cassilly, West and Waldstreicher)
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Cassilly, West and Waldstreicher)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Conference Committee Report {323528/1 Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Conference Committee Report {323528/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Criminal Law - Child Pornography
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 325
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Criminal Law - Child Pornography
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Law - Child Pornography
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {642213/1 Adopted 47
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Child Pornography
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 48A
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 47A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable with Amendments {518379/1 Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (42-0) 60
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 62
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 House Requests Senate Recede 62
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Atterbeary, R. Watson and Pippy) 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 House Requests Senate Recede 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Atterbeary, R. Watson and Pippy) 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Refuses Recede 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Cassilly, West and Waldstreicher) 62A
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Senate Refuses Recede 64
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Cassilly, West and Waldstreicher) 64
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Conference Committee Report {323528/1 Adopted 68
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 68
Senate 4/08/2019 4/03/2019 Conference Committee Report {323528/1 Adopted 66
Senate 4/08/2019 4/03/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 66
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Criminal Law - Child Pornography
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 325
Text - Chapter - Criminal Law - Child Pornography
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-101, 11-105, 11-207, 11-208 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM