Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners – Membership – Nomination and Appointment Process
Sponsored by
Delegate Saab
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a provision of law that requires the Governor to appoint certain members of the State Board of Dental Examiners from a list of names submitted to the Governor by the Board; requiring the Governor to appoint certain members of the Board from a list of qualified individuals submitted by certain organizations and certain petitions submitted to the Secretary of Health and the Governor; repealing a requirement that a certain number of names be submitted for a certain vacancy on the Board; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
4/05/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
41AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Board of Dental Examiners – Membership – Nomination and Appointment Process
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 4/05/2021 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2021 3/21/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Board of Dental Examiners – Membership – Nomination and Appointment Process
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 41AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Referred Rules 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/8/2021 3:33 PM
Click to return on the top page