Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Breweries - Annual Production Limit
Sponsored by
Wicomico County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 294
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing to 45,000 the limit in Wicomico County on the number of barrels of malt beverages that a micro-brewery may collectively brew, bottle, or contract for in a calendar year.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0755 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 294
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 40
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Second Reading Passed 40
House 3/12/2015 3/12/2015 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 42
Senate 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 42
Senate 3/31/2015 4/01/2015 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2015 3/27/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 54
Senate 4/01/2015 3/27/2015 Second Reading Passed 54
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 55
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 294
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM