Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Physicians - Genetic Counselors - Licensing
Sponsored by
Delegates Carr and Arentz
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Physicians to license genetic counselors; providing that provisions of the Act do not limit the right of certain individuals to practice certain occupations; establishing the Genetic Counseling Advisory Committee within the Board; requiring individuals, on or after October 1, 2022, to be licensed by the Board as genetic counselors before practicing genetic counseling in the State except under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0763
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Board of Physicians - Genetic Counselors - Licensing
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Board of Physicians - Genetic Counselors - Licensing
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Age
Statutes
(   14-5G-01 through 14-5G-28 )
Last Updated: 2/25/2020 4:57 PM