Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road - Lane Changes
Sponsored by
Delegates Malone, Beidle, Dumais, Flanagan, Fraser-Hidalgo, McComas, and Otto
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances under which a driver may move out of or into a lane by authorizing the move when the driver has reasonably determined it is safe to do so and activated the appropriate turn signal; prohibiting a person from moving a vehicle right or left on a roadway in order to change lanes unless the person gives an appropriate signal in a specified manner, subject to a specified exception; providing that a violation of the Act is not a moving violation for the purpose of assessing points; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2016 2/11/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2016 4/05/2016 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-309, 21-604, 21-605, 27-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM