Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Deferred Water and Sewer Charges Homeowner Disclosure Act of 2014 PG 413-14
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 441
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a registered home builder in Prince George's County to include specified information relating to deferred water and sewer charges in specified sales contracts under specified circumstances; requiring a specified contract for the initial sale of residential real property in the county to include specified information relating to deferred water and sewer charges; requiring the county to study issues related to deferred water and sewer charges and report the findings to the Prince George's County Senators and Delegates; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {140412/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 441
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/06/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/24/2014 2/24/2014 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2014 3/13/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Favorable with Amendments {140412/1 Report Adopted 46
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 47
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47
Senate 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2014 4/02/2014 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 61
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 Returned Passed 66
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 441
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-117, 14-117.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM