Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Civil Actions - Duty to Render Assistance
Sponsored by
Delegates Lisanti and Chang
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an individual to provide reasonable assistance to certain first responders who are under threat of or have incurred serious physical injury if providing such assistance does not endanger self or others; establishing a certain penalty for a violation of the Act; providing civil immunity for a certain individual who renders reasonable assistance to another individual under the Act subject to certain limitations; and providing for the construction of the Act.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Civil Actions - Duty to Render Assistance
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 11:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Civil Actions - Duty to Render Assistance
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Hearing 3/01 at 11:30 a.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM