Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Ethics – Lobbyists – Gift Exception and Regulated Activities Exemption
Sponsored by
Delegate Miller
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Specifying an exception to the definition of the term "entity" to include a governmental unit that employs an individual regulated lobbyist for the purposes of allowing certain officials and employees to accept certain gifts under certain circumstances; repealing a provision of law that exempts from regulation of lobbying activities an appearance of a certain employee of an association engaged only in representing counties or municipal corporations; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0974
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0617 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Ethics – Lobbyists – Gift Exception and Regulated Activities Exemption
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-505, 5-702 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:18 PM