Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Denial of Petition Without Hearing
Sponsored by
Delegates Sanchez and Vallario
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a provision of law to authorize, rather than require, a court to hold a hearing on a petition for expungement if the State's Attorney files a timely objection to the petition; authorizing a court to deny a petition for expungement without a hearing if the court finds that the petition is barred as a matter of law; authorizing a certain petitioner to request a hearing within 30 days under certain circumstances; requiring the court to hold a hearing under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0374 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Denial of Petition Without Hearing
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Denial of Petition Without Hearing
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {998076/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Denial of Petition Without Hearing
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 44
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Denial of Petition Without Hearing
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 45
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 47
Senate 3/20/2018 3/20/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Favorable with Amendments {998076/1 Adopted 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 67
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM