Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Aquaculture Lease Applications - Notice, Protests, and Meetings - Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegates Clark, Lehman, and Stein
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the persons that the Department of Natural Resources is required to notify of applications for certain aquaculture leases to be issued in the Chesapeake Bay or the Atlantic Coastal Bays; requiring the Department to work with both a person that files a certain protest petition related to a proposed aquaculture lease and the applicant for the aquaculture lease to mitigate the concerns raised in the petition; and establishing conditions under which the Department is required to hold a certain public information meeting.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0950
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2020
Legislative Date
2/26/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Aquaculture Lease Applications - Notice, Protests, and Meetings - Alterations
House 2/26/2020 2/26/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-11A-09 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:18 PM