Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Care Facilities – Assisted Living Programs – Regulations, Staffing, and Training
Sponsored by
Delegate Krimm
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring that certain regulations adopted by the Maryland Department of Health relating to assisted living programs include requiring an assisted living program to complete a certain assessment tool within a certain period of time and requiring a certain program manager to invite certain individuals to participate in certain resident assessments; requiring that certain assisted living programs have certain staff-to-resident ratios at certain assisted living program facilities under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0969
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Care Facilities – Assisted Living Programs – Regulations, Staffing, and Training
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/05/2020 3/05/2020 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-1805, 19-1805.1, 19-1807 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:18 PM