Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Commercial Receivership Act
Sponsored by
Delegate Carey
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 284
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a framework for a court to oversee the management and disposition of commercial property subject to receivership; providing standards and guidelines for the appointment, authority, and termination of a receiver over receivership property; establishing duties that may be required of a receiver; establishing a procedure for the transfer of receivership property; repealing certain provisions of law regarding an assignee for the benefit of creditors; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0695
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Commercial Receivership Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {253391/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Commercial Receivership Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 284
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Maryland Commercial Receivership Act
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Maryland Commercial Receivership Act
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments {253391/1 Adopted 50
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
Text - Third - Maryland Commercial Receivership Act
House 3/20/2019 3/16/2019 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 51
Senate 3/20/2019 3/18/2019 Referred Rules 50
Senate 3/29/2019 4/01/2019 Rereferred to Finance
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable Adopted 60
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 61
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 284
Text - Chapter - Maryland Commercial Receivership Act
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-101, 15-102, 15-103, 24-101 through 24-801 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM