Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Bond Authority – Maryland State Ceiling and Housing Bond Allocations
Sponsored by
Delegate Holmes
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing a certain issuer receiving a certain housing bond allocation to transfer all or any portion of the housing bond allocation to another issuer for the issuance of housing bonds; requiring the unused balance of the initial housing bond allocation to a housing authority and certain other allocations to be reallocated in a certain manner; altering the reallocation of certain bond allocations; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Bond Authority – Maryland State Ceiling and Housing Bond Allocations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Bond Authority – Maryland State Ceiling and Housing Bond Allocations
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
House 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2021 3/01/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:20 PM
Click to return on the top page