Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical Services Members
Sponsored by
Delegates Buckel, Beitzel, Corderman, Hornberger, Impallaria, Krebs, Luedtke, McComas, McKay, Otto, Parrott, Rose, Shoemaker, Szeliga, Wivell, Afzali, Ali, Ebersole, C. Howard, Kaiser, Long, Mosby, Reilly, Tarlau, Turner, Wilkins, and Jackson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 582
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the amount of a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for certain qualifying volunteer fire, rescue, and emergency medical services members.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1269
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {675464/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
48BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {909333/1
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/2 (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {909333/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 582
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical Services Members
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {675464/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical Services Members
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Budget and Taxation 48BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments {909333/1 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Motion Special Order until 4/2 (Senator Smith) Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable with Amendments {909333/1 Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical Services Members
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 582
Text - Chapter - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical Services Members
(   10-208 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page