Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Water Supply - Private Well Safety Program
Sponsored by
Delegate Stewart
Status
In the House - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring an owner of residential rental property that is served by a private water supply well to provide water quality testing every 3 years and to disclose to a tenant certain results; requiring the owner of a residential rental property that is served by a private water supply well to notify the Department of the Environment and the local health department about well contamination, provide a potable water supply until the contamination is remediated and resolve the contamination within 60 days after learning of the contamination; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2021
Legislative Date
2/07/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Water Supply - Private Well Safety Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {630819/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Adams) Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {603929/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (42-89)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {853226/1 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (38-92)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Water Supply - Private Well Safety Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (89-46)
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
30AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
4/10/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {564436/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (37-10)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/28/2021
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/28/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Adams) Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/30/2021
Action
Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Barve) Adopted (90-45)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/30/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (89-46)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2021
Legislative Date
3/30/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Water Supply - Private Well Safety Program
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/07/2021 2/07/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Water Supply - Private Well Safety Program
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/20/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments {630819/1 Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Adams) Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2021 3/10/2021 Floor Amendment {603929/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (42-89) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2021 3/10/2021 Floor Amendment {853226/1 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (38-92) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2021 3/10/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Water Supply - Private Well Safety Program
House 3/22/2021 3/11/2021 Third Reading Passed (89-46) 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/03/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 30AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2021 3/24/2021 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 4/10/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Favorable with Amendments {564436/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Third Reading Passed (37-10) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/28/2021 House Concurs Senate Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/28/2021 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Adams) Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/30/2021 Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Barve) Adopted (90-45) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/30/2021 Third Reading Passed (89-46) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/13/2021 3/30/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Water Supply - Private Well Safety Program
Age
(   9-4A-01 through 9-4A-16 )
(   10-711 )
Last Updated: 4/13/2021 1:55 PM
Click to return on the top page