Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Victim's Representative Notification - License Suspension Hearing
Sponsored by
Delegates Valentino-Smith, Holmes, Kramer, McComas, McCray, Sanchez, and Fraser-Hidalgo
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 702
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission to distribute the victim's representation notification form developed by the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to each law enforcement agency in the State; requiring a specified investigating agency to provide specified information and a specified form to a victim's representative; altering the time period during which a victim's representative may file a specified form to at least 30 days prior to a specified hearing; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {312213/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {818474/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 702
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Victim's Representative Notification - License Suspension Hearing
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Favorable with Amendments {312213/1 Adopted 45
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Victim's Representative Notification - License Suspension Hearing
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 46A
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 45
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable with Amendments {818474/1 Adopted 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63A
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 69
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 69
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Vehicle Laws - Victim's Representative Notification - License Suspension Hearing
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 702
Text - Chapter - Vehicle Laws - Victim's Representative Notification - License Suspension Hearing
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-206.1, 16-206 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM