Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation Network Companies - Insurance
Sponsored by
Delegates Brooks, D. Barnes, Bromwell, Carey, Dumais, Fennell, Glenn, Haynes, Hettleman, Mosby, Patterson, Proctor, Qi, Sample-Hughes, Stein, Walker, R. Watson, Wilson, and P. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 226
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Motor Vehicle Administration to accept a certain form of security from a transportation network company in place of a certain insurance policy if the other form of security adequately provides certain benefits and if the transportation network company is an affiliate of a company that provides taxicab services and has no fewer than 26 nor more than 300 operators; requiring transportation network companies to provide evidence of certain security to the Public Service Commission under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0701
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Transportation Network Companies - Insurance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Transportation Network Companies - Insurance
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {167178/2 Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Transportation Network Companies - Insurance
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 226
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Transportation Network Companies - Insurance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Transportation Network Companies - Insurance
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 40
Text - Third - Transportation Network Companies - Insurance
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 42
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Referred Finance 42
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Favorable with Amendments {167178/2 Adopted 56
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 59
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 59
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Transportation Network Companies - Insurance
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 226
Text - Chapter - Transportation Network Companies - Insurance
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   17-103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM