Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Counties and Municipalities - Required Legislation or Regulations - Adoption by Reference
Sponsored by
Delegates Eckardt, Beidle, Jacobs, and McDermott
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 494
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a county or municipality to adopt specified State laws or regulations by reference under specified circumstances; requiring specified counties or municipalities to specify whether the county or municipality also adopts by reference specified amendments to the State law or regulation and to specify any exceptions if the State law or regulation authorizes local options; providing that the Act does not affect a specified requirement and does not grant specified authority; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/23/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {530012/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 494
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/22/2013 3/23/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Favorable with Amendments {530012/1 Report Adopted 53
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53
House 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 54
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 52
Senate 3/26/2013 3/26/2013 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/28/2013 3/28/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 4/03/2013 4/04/2013 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 494
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-1302, 1-1302 through 1-1308 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM