Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

HB1076


CH0420

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Homestead Property Tax Credit - Date of Transfer of Dwelling
Sponsored by
Delegate Kaiser
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 420
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the deadline for a new owner of a dwelling to submit an application to the State Department of Assessments and Taxation requesting that the date of the deed be accepted as the date of transfer of the dwelling for purposes of the homestead tax credit under certain circumstances; providing that property tax is not due on a dwelling for a certain taxable year until 30 days after a revised tax bill is sent to the homeowner if the homeowner submits a certain application after a certain date under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Homestead Property Tax Credit - Date of Transfer of Dwelling
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Homestead Property Tax Credit - Date of Transfer of Dwelling
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-3)
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 420
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Homestead Property Tax Credit - Date of Transfer of Dwelling
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/05/2020 3/05/2020 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/05/2020 3/05/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 42
Text - Third - Homestead Property Tax Credit - Date of Transfer of Dwelling
House 3/09/2020 3/06/2020 Third Reading Passed (131-3) 43A
Senate 3/10/2020 3/05/2020 Referred Budget and Taxation 44
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 52
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 52
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 420
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:17 PM