Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Facilities - Hospitals - Medical Debt Protection
Sponsored by
Delegates Charkoudian, Crutchfield, Fennell, Kelly, Lehman, Lierman, Ruth, Shetty, Solomon, Terrasa, Turner, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a hospital to annually submit a report to the Health Services Cost Review Commission on the total number of patients by race or ethnicity, gender, and zip code against whom the hospital has filed an action to collect a debt, or to whom the hospital has and has not reported or classified a bad debt, and the total amount of costs owed but not collected; requiring that a certain policy provide a mechanism to a patient to modify a payment plan and prohibit the hospital from collecting a certain debt for a certain patient; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0873
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health Facilities - Hospitals - Medical Debt Protection
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Facilities - Hospitals - Medical Debt Protection
House 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   19-214.2 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:19 PM
Click to return on the top page