Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Justice Reinvestment Act - Modifications
Sponsored by
Delegate Dumais
Status
In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that a certain presumption may be rebutted if a certain commissioner or court finds and states on the record at a certain time that adhering to certain limits would create a certain risk to certain individuals; authorizing a certain commissioner or court to take certain actions on finding that adhering to certain limits would create a certain risk to certain individuals; requiring the State's Attorney, rather than the court, to send a certain notice to a certain victim at the victim's last known address; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0593
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1418 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary and Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Justice Reinvestment Act - Modifications
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {212218/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Justice Reinvestment Act - Modifications
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (92-43)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {388573/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Dumais, Malone and Sydnor)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Dumais, Malone and Sydnor)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Brochin, Hough and Lee)
Proceedings
67
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 First Reading Judiciary and Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Justice Reinvestment Act - Modifications
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {212218/1 Adopted 47
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Justice Reinvestment Act - Modifications
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Third Reading Passed (92-43) 48
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48B
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable with Amendments {388573/1 Adopted 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 65
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 68
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 House Requests Senate Recede 68
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Dumais, Malone and Sydnor) 68
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 67
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 House Requests Senate Recede 67
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Dumais, Malone and Sydnor) 67
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Senate Refuses Recede 67
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Brochin, Hough and Lee) 67
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-401, 7-504 )
(   5-601, 5-609.1, 5-612.1, 5-620 )
(   10-110, 6-223, 6-224 )
(   9-3202, 9-3203 )
(   16-303 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM