Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Consumer Protection - Caller ID Spoofing Ban of 2018
Sponsored by
Delegate Afzali
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 515
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting an individual or a person from taking certain actions to provide false location information when placing a telephone call with the intent to defraud, harass, cause harm, or wrongfully obtain anything of value; providing for the application of the Act; and establishing a certain penalty for providing false location information when placing a call.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Consumer Protection - Caller ID Spoofing Ban of 2018
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {923594/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Consumer Protection - Caller ID Spoofing Ban of 2018
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {857677/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Consumer Protection - Caller ID Spoofing Ban of 2018
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 515
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Consumer Protection - Caller ID Spoofing Ban of 2018
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Consumer Protection - Caller ID Spoofing Ban of 2018
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Favorable with Amendments {923594/1 Adopted 44
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Consumer Protection - Caller ID Spoofing Ban of 2018
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 45
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Referred Finance 47
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Favorable with Amendments {857677/1 Adopted 63
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 64
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 67
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 67
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Consumer Protection - Caller ID Spoofing Ban of 2018
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 515
Text - Chapter - Consumer Protection - Caller ID Spoofing Ban of 2018
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-301, 13-401, 13-408, 14-1326 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM