Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Uniform Real Property Electronic Recording Act
Sponsored by
Delegate Platt
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 516
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing that requirements of certain laws specifying a certain document be in a certain form or signed as a condition for recording are met by an electronic document or electronic signature under certain circumstances; requiring the clerk of a circuit court to continue to accept paper documents and place entries for electronic and paper documents in the same index under certain circumstances, and transmit documents in fully verified books to the State Archives for preservation and publication on the Archives' website; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Uniform Real Property Electronic Recording Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {820112/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Uniform Real Property Electronic Recording Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 516
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Maryland Uniform Real Property Electronic Recording Act
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Uniform Real Property Electronic Recording Act
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Favorable with Amendments {820112/1 Adopted 45
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Maryland Uniform Real Property Electronic Recording Act
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 46A
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48A
Senate 3/20/2018 3/20/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Favorable Adopted 62A
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Second Reading Passed 62A
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 63
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 516
Text - Chapter - Maryland Uniform Real Property Electronic Recording Act
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-701 through 3-707 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM