Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income (The Jonathan Porto Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates P. Young, Lisanti, Kaiser, Walker, D. Barnes, Boteler, Buckel, Cain, Ebersole, Feldmark, Guyton, Hornberger, Ivey, Long, Luedtke, Mosby, Palakovich Carr, Patterson, Reilly, Rose, Shoemaker, Turner, Washington, and Wilkins
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 380
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Including income from certain death benefits within a certain subtraction modification allowed under the Maryland income tax for certain military retirement income; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2018.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {165968/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {399037/1 Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/1 (Senator Serafini) Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 380
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income
House 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Favorable with Amendments {165968/1 Adopted 43
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
Text - Third - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 44
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Referred Budget and Taxation 44
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/29/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/29/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments {399037/1 Adopted 57
Senate 3/29/2019 3/25/2019 Motion Special Order until 4/1 (Senator Serafini) Adopted 57
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (42-0) 60
House 4/05/2019 3/28/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 63
House 4/05/2019 3/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 63
House 4/05/2019 3/28/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income (The Jonathan Porto Act)
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 380
Text - Chapter - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income (The Jonathan Porto Act)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM