Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Libraries - Reorganization of Governance Structure
Sponsored by
Delegates Hixson, Haynes, Jameson, Kramer, Lierman, Moon, Pena-Melnyk, Proctor, Sophocleus, Turner, Valderrama, M. Washington, and Rose
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 338
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland State Library Agency and the Maryland State Library Board; transferring the duties of the Library Development and Services Division in the State Department of Education to the State Library Agency; transferring the duties of the State Board of Education pertaining to libraries to the State Library Board; providing that the appointment of the State Librarian is subject to the advice and consent of the Senate; requiring geographic diversity in the Governor's appointments to the State Library Board; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0587
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - Libraries - Reorganization of Governance Structure
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {825865/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Education - Libraries - Reorganization of Governance Structure
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {959731/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Education - Libraries - Reorganization of Governance Structure
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 338
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Education - Libraries - Reorganization of Governance Structure
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education - Libraries - Reorganization of Governance Structure
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/18/2017 3/18/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable with Amendments {825865/1 Adopted 49
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
Text - Third - Education - Libraries - Reorganization of Governance Structure
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Third Reading Passed (128-0) 50
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Budget and Taxation Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 46A
Senate 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable with Amendments {959731/1 Adopted 58
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 59
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 66
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 66
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Education - Libraries - Reorganization of Governance Structure
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 338
Text - Chapter - Education - Libraries - Reorganization of Governance Structure
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   23-101, 23-101 through 23-108, 23-201, 23-202 through 23-205, 23-206, 23-301, 23-302, 23-402, 23-405, 23-406, 23-504, 23-506, 23-506.1, 23-507, 23-508, 23-509, 23-510, 25-302 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM