Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kits - Analysis
Sponsored by
Delegates Hettleman, Atterbeary, Barron, Buckel, Cain, Cardin, Charkoudian, Conaway, Dumais, W. Fisher, Gilchrist, Guyton, Healey, Ivey, Kelly, Korman, Lehman, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lisanti, Love, Luedtke, Moon, Mosby, Queen, Reznik, Shetty, Solomon, Sydnor, Terrasa, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, C. Watson, Wilkins, Palakovich Carr, Lopez, Grammer, Bartlett, Crutchfield, McComas, Pippy, Arikan, Cox, Anderson, Hartman, and Malone
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 34
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that a sexual assault evidence collection kit be submitted to a forensic laboratory for analysis unless a certain requirement is met; requiring that a victim who wishes to remain anonymous and not file a criminal complaint be informed that the victim may initiate a criminal complaint at a future time; requiring a certain law enforcement agency that receives a sexual assault evidence collection kit and all requested associated reference standards to submit the kit for forensic analysis within 30 days of receipt of the kit; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0767
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019, January 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {692311/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {518777/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {503729/1 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Third Readings Passed with Amendments (42-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 34
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kits - Analysis
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Favorable with Amendments {692311/1 Adopted 44
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kits - Analysis
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 46A
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 47
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable with Amendments {518777/1 Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Floor Amendment {503729/1 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 60
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Third Readings Passed with Amendments (42-0) 60
House 4/05/2019 3/28/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 63
House 4/05/2019 3/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 63
House 4/05/2019 3/28/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kits - Analysis
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 34
Text - Chapter - Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kits - Analysis
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-926, 11-927 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM