Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Historic African American Cemeteries Preservation Fund and Study
Sponsored by
Delegate Carr
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Historic African American Cemeteries Preservation Fund to identify, preserve, restore, protect, maintain, or commemorate graves, monuments, or markers at historic African American cemeteries; requiring the Department of Planning to administer the Fund in coordination with the Commission on African American History and Culture; requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation to the Fund; requiring the Department of Planning to make a certain report by July 1, 2022; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021, July 1, 2023
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2021
Legislative Date
2/06/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Historic African American Cemeteries Preservation Fund and Study
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/06/2021 2/06/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Historic African American Cemeteries Preservation Fund and Study
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:21 PM
Click to return on the top page