Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Subcutaneous Implanting of Identification Device - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegate Stein
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person or an agent, a representative, or a designee of the State or a local government from requiring, coercing, or compelling an individual to undergo a certain implanting of a certain identification device; authorizing an individual who is implanted with a subcutaneous identification device in violation of a certain provision of the Act to file a civil action in a certain court within 3 years after the date on which the identification device was implanted; providing for the prospective application of the Act; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0944
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
4/07/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {126585/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-2)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
65
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary
Text - First - Public Health - Subcutaneous Implanting of Identification Device - Prohibition
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 4/07/2018 4/07/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable with Amendments {126585/1 Adopted 64
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
Text - Third - Public Health - Subcutaneous Implanting of Identification Device - Prohibition
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-2) 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Referred Rules 65
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   20-1901, 20-1902 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM