Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force on Workplace Bullying in State Agencies
Sponsored by
Delegates P. Young, B. Barnes, Chang, Hayes, Hettleman, Hill, Korman, Krimm, McCray, Morales, Platt, Sydnor, and Tarlau
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force on Workplace Bullying in State Agencies; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding specified matters related to workplace bullying in State agencies; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and specified standing committees of the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2016; terminating the Act after June 30, 2017; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0689
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2016 2/11/2016 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page