Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists – Licensure, Disciplinary Action, Criminal History Records Checks, and Trainee Status – Revisions
Sponsored by
Delegates Sample-Hughes, R. Lewis, and P. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 409
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists to take action against a clinical professional counselor only if the Board discusses the proposed action with a Board member who is a licensed clinical professional counselor and who votes, either in the affirmative or negative, on the proposed action; repealing the requirement that the credit hours or educational requirements completed by certain applicants to be licensed by the Board be accredited by the American Art Therapy Association; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0958
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {456883/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
59A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 409
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Licensure, Criminal History Records Checks, and Trainee Status - Revisions
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments {456883/1 Adopted 40
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists – Licensure, Disciplinary Action, Criminal History Records Checks, and Trainee Status – Revisions
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 42
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 42
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable Adopted 58
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Second Reading Passed 58
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59A
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 409
Text - Chapter - State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists – Licensure, Disciplinary Action, Criminal History Records Checks, and Trainee Status – Revisions
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   17-205, 17-304.1, 17-304.2, 17-310, 17-501, 17-501.1, 17-503, 17-506, 17-509 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM