Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Procurement - Intergovernmental Cooperative Purchasing Agreements
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 774
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a specified procurement officer to make a specified determination before a primary procurement unit is authorized to take specified action regarding an intergovernmental cooperative purchasing agreement; requiring a primary procurement unit to post specified determinations on the primary procurement unit's Web site; requiring an intergovernmental cooperative purchasing agreement to be approved by a specified unit head and subject to specified other approval under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Procurement - Intergovernmental Cooperative Purchasing Agreements
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {396886/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Procurement - Intergovernmental Cooperative Purchasing Agreements
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {644135/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (141-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Procurement - Intergovernmental Cooperative Purchasing Agreements
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 774
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Procurement - Intergovernmental Cooperative Purchasing Agreements
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Procurement - Intergovernmental Cooperative Purchasing Agreements
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable with Amendments {396886/1 Adopted 48
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Procurement - Intergovernmental Cooperative Purchasing Agreements
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 49
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 46A
Senate 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments {644135/1 Adopted 60
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 61
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 67
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (141-0) 67
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Procurement - Intergovernmental Cooperative Purchasing Agreements
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 774
Text - Chapter - Procurement - Intergovernmental Cooperative Purchasing Agreements
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM