Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone
Sponsored by
Delegate Parrott
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the size of the safety zone to 50 yards for archery hunters in Washington County within which archery hunting may not take place except under certain circumstances; and requiring that an archery hunter in Washington County be in an elevated position when hunting any wild bird or mammal within 50 to 100 yards of certain buildings.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0140
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Washington County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Washington County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (126-3)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Washington County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone
House 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61
Text - Third - Washington County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (126-3) 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Referred Rules 62
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM