Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Special Police Officers - Training and Renewal of Commission
Sponsored by
Delegate J. Lewis
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 426
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing the authorization for the Secretary of State Police to require certain training; requiring a certain candidate for a commission as a special police officer to complete at least 80 hours of instruction; exempting a certain candidate for commission as a special police officer from completing certain instruction under certain circumstances; and requiring an applicant for the renewal of a commission as a special police officer to receive certain training before applying for renewal.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {762815/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 426
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Public Safety - Special Police Officers - Training and Renewal of Commission
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {762815/1 Adopted 48
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Public Safety - Special Police Officers - Training and Renewal of Commission
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 49
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 49
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Second Reading Passed 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 53C
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Returned Passed 53
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 426
Text - Chapter - Public Safety - Special Police Officers - Training and Renewal of Commission
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 7/8/2020 2:02 PM