Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Video Lottery Facility - Areas Prohibited to Individuals Under the Age of 21 Years - Employee Exception
Sponsored by
Chair, Ways and Means Committee (By Request - Departmental - Lottery and Gaming Control Agency)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 117
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a video lottery employee who works for a video lottery operation licensee and is an adult to enter and remain in an area within a video lottery facility designated for table game or video lottery terminal activities if the video lottery employee is working; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/20/2015
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2015
Legislative Date
2/24/2015
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-1)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2015
Legislative Date
4/14/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 117
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/17/2015 2/18/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/20/2015 2/20/2015 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 2/24/2015 2/24/2015 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 49
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 Second Reading Passed 49
House 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Third Reading Passed (138-1) 50
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation 47A
Senate 3/25/2015 3/25/2015 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/08/2015 4/09/2015 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 61
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 4/14/2015 4/14/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 117
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-136 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM