Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Prescription Drug Benefits - Retiree Benefits - Revisions
Sponsored by
Delegates Carey, Attar, Bhandari, Bridges, Bromwell, Busch, Cardin, Crosby, Hettleman, Jones, Kipke, Lafferty, McIntosh, Pendergrass, Rosenberg, Stein, Szeliga, and C. Watson
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing retirees who participate in a certain prescription drug benefit plan to elect to have a spouse or dependent child covered under a certain State plan; requiring the Department of Budget and Management, on or before January 1, 2020, to establish the Maryland State Retiree Prescription Drug Coverage Program that reimburses participants for out-of-pocket costs that exceed certain limits; requiring the Department to establish a Maryland State Retiree Life-Sustaining Prescription Drug Assistance Program; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0946
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Prescription Drug Benefits - Retiree Benefits - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/17/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {824568/1
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/17/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate B. Barnes) Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/17/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {824568/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/17/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Prescription Drug Benefits - Retiree Benefits - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (120-9)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {759335/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - State Prescription Drug Benefits - Retiree Benefits - Revisions
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/22/2019 3/22/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/22/2019 3/17/2019 Favorable with Amendments {824568/1 52
House 3/22/2019 3/17/2019 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate B. Barnes) Adopted 52
House 3/22/2019 3/17/2019 Favorable with Amendments {824568/1 Adopted 52
House 3/22/2019 3/17/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
Text - Third - State Prescription Drug Benefits - Retiree Benefits - Revisions
House 3/25/2019 3/18/2019 Third Reading Passed (120-9) 53
Senate 3/26/2019 3/22/2019 Referred Rules 54
Senate 3/29/2019 4/01/2019 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable with Amendments {759335/1 Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-508, 2-509, 2-509.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM