Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government – Regulations Impacting Small Businesses
Sponsored by
Delegates Brooks, D. Barnes, Branch, Bromwell, D.E. Davis, Dumais, Fennell, Gaines, Glenn, Hettleman, Jones, R. Lewis, Luedtke, Mosby, Patterson, Proctor, Qi, Queen, Sample-Hughes, Stein, Valderrama, Walker, C. Watson, R. Watson, P. Young, Bagnall, Barron, Carr, Charles, Chisholm, Cullison, Hill, Johnson, Kelly, Kerr, Kipke, Krebs, Metzgar, Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Rosenberg, Saab, Szeliga, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 212
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Budget and Management to provide certain units with training on the preparation of certain economic analyses; requiring a certain promulgating unit to establish an electronic registry and to post on the registry a proposed regulation or the scope of a proposed regulation; requiring certain notification when a proposed regulation or the scope of a proposed regulation is posted; repealing provisions of law relating to the Advisory Council on the Impact of Regulations on Small Businesses; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0855 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019, October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {806182/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {344838/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - State Government – Regulations Impacting Small Businesses
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 212
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - State Government – Regulations Impacting Small Businesses
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
Text - First - State Government - Regulations Impacting Small Businesses - Economic Impact Analyses
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {806182/1 Adopted 47
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - State Government - Regulations Impacting Small Businesses - Economic Impact Analyses
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 48A
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47A
Senate 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable with Amendments {344838/1 Adopted 61
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 65
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 65
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - State Government – Regulations Impacting Small Businesses
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 212
Text - Chapter - State Government – Regulations Impacting Small Businesses
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-501 through 3-508 )
(   10-101, 10-110, 10-224, 2-1505.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM