Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Service Commission - Application for Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Criteria to Consider
Sponsored by
Delegates Lisanti and Impallaria
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 283
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Public Service Commission to take final action on a certain application for a certificate of public convenience and necessity only after due consideration of the effect of a generating station, an overhead transmission line, or a qualified generator lead line on air quality and water pollution, rather than the effect of the generating station, overhead transmission line, or qualified generator lead line on air and water pollution when applicable; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {483094/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {593128/1 (Senator Madaleno)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/9 (Senator Reilly) Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {593128/1 (Senator Madaleno) Withdrawn
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {773620/1 (Senator Madaleno) Rejected (19-25)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 283
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Public Service Commission - Application for Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Criteria to Consider
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {483094/1 Adopted 47A
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - Public Service Commission - Application for Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Criteria to Consider
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 48
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Finance 48B
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/04/2018 4/04/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Favorable Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Floor Amendment {593128/1 (Senator Madaleno) 63
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Motion Special Order until 4/9 (Senator Reilly) Adopted 63
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Floor Amendment {593128/1 (Senator Madaleno) Withdrawn 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Floor Amendment {773620/1 (Senator Madaleno) Rejected (19-25) 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 64
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 67
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 283
Text - Chapter - Public Service Commission - Application for Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Criteria to Consider
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM