Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Assault on a Law Enforcement Officer (Police Protection Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Shoemaker, Afzali, Arentz, Carozza, Cassilly, Ciliberti, Cluster, Hornberger, Kittleman, Krebs, Long, Malone, McComas, Metzgar, W. Miller, Rose, Saab, and Vogt
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a District Court commissioner from authorizing the pretrial release of a defendant who is charged with assault in the first degree or assault in the second degree against a victim who is a law enforcement officer; providing that a judge may authorize the pretrial release of a certain defendant on suitable bail or certain other conditions or both; requiring a judge to order the continued detention of a defendant who is considered likely to flee or one who poses a danger to another person or community; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0736
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Assault on a Law Enforcement Officer (Police Protection Act)
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM