Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Fisheries - Commercial Oyster Divers
Sponsored by
Delegates Jacobs, Arentz, Fisher, Ghrist, Grammer, Long, Mautz, Metzgar, and Otto
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 518
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the tidal fish license and oyster authorization requirements for persons aboard a boat who are using diving apparatus to catch oysters for commercial purposes in the waters of the State; prohibiting more than two commercial oyster divers from working on a boat at a time; requiring each commercial oyster diver to have an attendant on the boat; establishing certain daily limits on the oyster catch; establishing that exceeding the oyster catch limits under certain circumstances is a violation of the Act; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Natural Resources - Fisheries - Commercial Oyster Divers
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {950310/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Natural Resources - Fisheries - Commercial Oyster Divers
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {864337/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Stein, Jacobs and Gilchrist)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Stein, Jacobs and Gilchrist)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Kagan, Young and Waugh)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Kagan, Young and Waugh)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Conference Committee Report {223422/1 Adopted
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Conference Committee Report {223422/1 Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Natural Resources - Fisheries - Commercial Oyster Divers
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 518
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Natural Resources - Fisheries - Commercial Oyster Divers
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Natural Resources - Fisheries - Commercial Oyster Divers
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Favorable with Amendments {950310/1 Adopted 45
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Natural Resources - Fisheries - Commercial Oyster Divers
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 46A
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48A
Senate 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2018 4/04/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Favorable with Amendments {864337/1 Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 63
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 House Requests Senate Recede 63
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Stein, Jacobs and Gilchrist) 63
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 65
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 House Requests Senate Recede 65
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Stein, Jacobs and Gilchrist) 65
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Senate Refuses Recede 65
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Kagan, Young and Waugh) 65
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Senate Refuses Recede 68
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Kagan, Young and Waugh) 68
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Conference Committee Report {223422/1 Adopted 69
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 69
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Conference Committee Report {223422/1 Adopted 67
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 67
House 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Natural Resources - Fisheries - Commercial Oyster Divers
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 518
Text - Chapter - Natural Resources - Fisheries - Commercial Oyster Divers
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-1015.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM