Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches - Relationship with Dealers
Sponsored by
Delegate Frush
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting, except under specified circumstances, a manufacturer, distributor, or factory branch from requiring, attempting to require, coercing, or attempting to coerce a dealer to purchase specified goods or services from specified vendors under specified circumstances; requiring a manufacturer, distributor, or factory branch licensed in the State to specify in writing to its motor vehicle dealers specified information relating to the compensation of dealers for parts and labor; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Rules
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0886
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/22/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Rereferred to Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {540111/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-1)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
62
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/22/2013 2/22/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 2/25/2013 2/26/2013 Rereferred to Environmental Matters
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2013 4/04/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Favorable with Amendments {540111/1 Report Adopted 62
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
House 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Third Reading Passed (134-1) 63
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 First Reading Senate Rules 62
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-207, 15-212 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM