Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health - Mobile Response and Stabilization System for Children and Families in Maryland - Study
Sponsored by
Delegate Charles
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health and the Governor's Commission to Study Mental and Behavioral Health in Maryland jointly to take certain actions in order to develop and implement a comprehensive mobile response and stabilization system for children and families in the State; and requiring the Department and the Commission jointly to submit their findings and recommendations to certain committees in the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2020.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0624
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health - Mobile Response and Stabilization System for Children and Families in Maryland - Study
House 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/6/2020 12:01 PM