Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Apprenticeship Career Training Pilot Program for Formerly Incarcerated Individuals - Report
Sponsored by
Delegates Haynes, M. Jackson, Proctor, Queen, and Valderrama
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 432
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Labor to submit an annual report on the Apprenticeship Career Training Pilot Program for Formerly Incarcerated Individuals on or before September 30 each year.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2020
Legislative Date
2/26/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
38A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 432
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Apprenticeship Career Training Pilot Program for Formerly Incarcerated Individuals - Report
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 2/26/2020 2/26/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 36
Text - Third - Labor and Employment - Apprenticeship Career Training Pilot Program for Formerly Incarcerated Individuals - Report
House 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 38
Senate 3/02/2020 2/28/2020 Referred Finance 38A
Senate 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 52
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 52
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 432
Text - Chapter - Labor and Employment - Apprenticeship Career Training Pilot Program for Formerly Incarcerated Individuals - Report
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 7/8/2020 2:02 PM