Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study Energy Generation in Prince George's County PG 416-13
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 668
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a Task Force to Study Energy Generation in Prince George's County; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding specified matters; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {783293/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (122-14)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {607779/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (118-17)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 668
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/21/2013 3/22/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/22/2013 3/19/2013 Favorable with Amendments {783293/1 Report Adopted 52
House 3/22/2013 3/19/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Third Reading Passed (122-14) 53
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 First Reading Finance 52
Senate 3/26/2013 3/26/2013 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/05/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments {607779/1 Report Adopted 63
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 64
House 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 House Concur - Senate Amendments 69
House 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Third Reading Passed (118-17) 69
House 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Passed Enrolled 69
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 668
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM