Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public School Employee Whistleblower Protection Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Tarlau, Angel, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Ebersole, Fennell, Frush, Hayes, C. Howard, Luedtke, Morales, Mosby, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Sanchez, Shoemaker, Turner, Walker, A. Washington, M. Washington, Wilkins, K. Young, Ali, and Afzali
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 730
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a public school employer from taking or refusing to take specified personnel actions as a reprisal against public school employees who disclose specified behavior; providing that specified protections under the Act apply only if specified employees have a good faith belief that the employer is engaged or has engaged in unlawful activity which poses a danger to public health or safety; requiring a public school employee to exhaust all administrative remedies before instituting a specified civil action; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public School Employee Whistleblower Protection Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {145266/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public School Employee Whistleblower Protection Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Reassigned to Finance
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 10:00 PM (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (36-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 730
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Public School Employee Whistleblower Protection Act
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Public School Employee Whistleblower Protection Act
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments {145266/1 Adopted 47
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Public School Employee Whistleblower Protection Act
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 48
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 46A
Senate 3/22/2017 3/20/2017 Reassigned to Finance 49
Senate 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable Adopted 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Motion Special Order until 10:00 PM (Senator Ready) Adopted 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (36-0) 63A
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Returned Passed 70
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 730
Text - Chapter - Public School Employee Whistleblower Protection Act
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-901 through 6-906 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM