Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Assault on Public Transportation Operator - Penalties and Reporting
Sponsored by
Delegates Metzgar, Arikan, Buckel, Cox, Grammer, Jacobs, Mangione, Parrott, Saab, and Shoemaker
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering certain penalties for intentionally causing physical injury to a bus operator, a train operator, a light rail operator, or any other operator of a vehicle providing transportation services; requiring State and local transportation authorities to annually report certain information to the Attorney General; requiring the Attorney General to report to the Governor and the presiding officers of the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2020, and annually thereafter; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Law - Assault on Public Transportation Operator - Penalties and Reporting
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-203 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM