Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems, Speed Monitoring Systems, and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - Citation Responses
Sponsored by
Delegate Conaway
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering a certain warning on a citation issued for a violation recorded by a traffic control signal monitoring system, a speed monitoring system, or a work zone speed control system to state that a person alleged to be liable must pay the civil penalty or contest liability within 60 days after the date of issuance of the citation in order to avoid an automatic admission of liability.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {420912/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-3)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems, Speed Monitoring Systems, and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - Citation Responses
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable with Amendments {420912/1 Adopted 44
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems, Speed Monitoring Systems, and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - Citation Responses
House 3/12/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (129-3) 47
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 47
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-202.1, 21-809, 21-810 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:22 PM