Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Commerce – Small Business Innovation Research and Technology Transfer – Study
Sponsored by
Delegates Qi, Acevero, Bromwell, Brooks, Cain, Carey, Carr, Corderman, Crosby, D.E. Davis, Dumais, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Healey, Hill, Hornberger, Jalisi, Kelly, Kerr, Kittleman, Korman, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lopez, Luedtke, Palakovich Carr, Patterson, Queen, Reznik, Shetty, Shoemaker, Smith, Solomon, Stewart, Valderrama, Wilkins, and Wilson
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Commerce to conduct a study on issues related to federal small business innovation research and technology transfer grants; and requiring the Department to report its findings and recommendations regarding funding options for grant recipients to the General Assembly by December 31, 2019; and terminating the Act after June 30, 2020.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Rules
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0574
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {245069/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
65
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Maryland Small Business Innovation Research and Technology Transfer Incentive Program
House 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Favorable with Amendments {245069/1 Adopted 66
House 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66
Text - Third - Department of Commerce – Small Business Innovation Research and Technology Transfer – Study
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 67
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Referred Rules 65
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM