Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government – Government Agents – Requests for and Use of Immigration Status Information
Sponsored by
Delegates Atterbeary, Acevero, Carr, Cullison, W. Fisher, Hill, Ivey, Kelly, R. Lewis, Moon, Mosby, Palakovich Carr, Pena-Melnyk, Shetty, and K. Young
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting, except under certain circumstances, a government agent from requesting information about immigration or citizenship status of a person or a person's family members or acquaintances; prohibiting a government agent from coercing information or action from a person by using certain information; prohibiting a government agent from detaining or questioning a person based on a certain immigration or citizenship status of the person or any other person; authorizing a person to use a certain legal remedy under certain circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0718
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {942217/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Morgan) Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {423429/1 (Delegate Saab) Rejected (39-91)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (91-48)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - State Government – Government Agents – Requests for and Use of Immigration Status Information
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {942217/1 Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Morgan) Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Floor Amendment {423429/1 (Delegate Saab) Rejected (39-91) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Government – Government Agents – Requests for and Use of Immigration Status Information
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (91-48) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page