Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Apprenticeship Career Training Pilot Program for Formerly Incarcerated Individuals - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegates Haynes and Glenn
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 726
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Apprenticeship Career Training Pilot Program for Formerly Incarcerated Individuals; establishing the purpose and method for administering the Program; requiring the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation to administer the Program; establishing certain standards under which certain employers may be eligible to receive certain grants; requiring the Department to adopt certain regulations; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 726
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Apprenticeship Career Training Pilot Program for Formerly Incarcerated Individuals - Establishment
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 46
Text - Third - Labor and Employment - Apprenticeship Career Training Pilot Program for Formerly Incarcerated Individuals - Establishment
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 48
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Finance 47A
Senate 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Favorable Adopted 56
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Second Reading Passed 56
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 726
Text - Chapter - Labor and Employment - Apprenticeship Career Training Pilot Program for Formerly Incarcerated Individuals - Establishment
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM