Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Peer-to-Peer Car Sharing - Sunset Repeal and Rate Alteration
Sponsored by
Delegate Kaiser
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the termination of certain provisions of law making sales and charges related to peer-to-peer car sharing subject to a certain sales and use tax rate; repealing an exemption for certain peer-to-peer car sharing programs from certain requirements that marketplace facilitators collect the sales and use tax on certain sales; altering the sales and use tax rate imposed on certain shared motor vehicles used for peer-to-peer car sharing; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0825
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020, July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Peer-to-Peer Car Sharing - Sunset Repeal and Rate Alteration
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-101, 11-104 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:23 PM